Sebastian EVERDING
Constituencies
- Partei Mensch Umwelt Tierschutz Germany 2024/07/16 -
Groups
- GUE/NGL Member of the Bureau The Left group in the European Parliament - GUE/NGL 2024/07/18 -
Show earlier Groups...
- GUE/NGL Member The Left group in the European Parliament - GUE/NGL 2024/07/16 - 2024/07/17
Committees
Role | Committee | Start | End |
---|---|---|---|
Member of | Committee on Agriculture and Rural Development | 2024/07/19 | |
Substitute of | Committee on Fisheries | 2024/07/19 | |
Substitute of | Committee on the Environment, Public Health and Food Safety | 2024/07/19 |
Delegations
Role | Delegation | Start | End |
---|---|---|---|
Member of | Delegation for relations with Bosnia and Herzegovina and Kosovo, including the EU-Bosnia and Herzegovina Stabilisation and Association Parliamentary Committee and the EU-Kosovo Stabilisation and Association Parliamentary Committee | 2024/09/19 | |
Member of | Delegation to the EU-Albania Stabilisation and Association Parliamentary Committee | 2024/09/19 |
Contact
- [javascript protected email address]
Brussels
- Phone: 003222845669
- Fax:
- Office: Bât. ALTIERO SPINELLI 08H140
- Full Address
- City: Bruxelles/Brussel
- Zip: B-1047
- Street: 60, rue Wiertz / Wiertzstraat 60
Strasbourg
- Phone: 0033388175669
- Fax:
- Office: Bât. SALVADOR DE MADARIAGA G02050
- Full Address
- City: Strasbourg
- Zip: CS 91024 - F-67070
- Street: 1, avenue du Président Robert Schuman
Activities
Stats
Amendment Co-authors
Name | Group | Country | Ams |
---|---|---|---|
Anja HAZEKAMP | GUE/NGL | Netherlands | 112 |
Per CLAUSEN | GUE/NGL | Denmark | 104 |
Catarina MARTINS | GUE/NGL | Portugal | 104 |
Emma FOURREAU | GUE/NGL | France | 102 |
Nikolas FARANTOURIS | GUE/NGL | Greece | 73 |
Giorgos GEORGIOU | GUE/NGL | Cyprus | 72 |
Jonas SJÖSTEDT | GUE/NGL | Sweden | 65 |
Lynn BOYLAN | GUE/NGL | Ireland | 59 |
Li ANDERSSON | GUE/NGL | Finland | 15 |
By types
Amendments (118)Plenary speeches (2)
Written questions (1)
By dossiers
Count | Dossier Reference | Title |
104 | 2024/2718(RSP) | |
14 | 2024/0176(BUD) | 2025 general budget: all sections |
See historical changes of the Bio
Education (qualifications and diplomas)
- 01/08/1993-31/07/2003 : Secondary school leaving certificate (general higher education entrance qualification) – Leibniz Gymnasium Dortmund
- 01/08/2004-31/01/2008 : Apprenticeship as an information electronics technician – GST in Bochum
- 01/03/2007-15/02/2008 : Training licence pursuant to the German Ordinance on Trainer Aptitude (AEVO) Company assistant (Master Craftsman Qualification, Parts III and IV)
- 01/04/2008-15/09/2008 : Certified business economist (under the Crafts and Trades Code (HwO)) – Handwerkskammer Südwestfalen
- 01/11/2008-31/10/2009 : Master IT technician – Bachelor Professional qualification in IT
- 01/09/2020-15/01/2021 : Hamburger Fern-Hochschule (HFH) – Sustainability Management
- 01/08/2021-30/10/2022 : Bachelor of Science – Business Management (Marketing) – Triagon Academy
- 01/12/2022- ... : FH Burgenland – MBA in Business Psychology
Professional career
- 01/08/2008-30/06/2011 : Technology editor – Satvision & ETM Testmagazin magazines
- 01/07/2011-31/12/2012 : Manager – Lingenhoff GmbH & Co. KG
- 01/01/2013-31/12/2018 : Managing partner – Lingenhoff GmbH & Co. KG
- 01/01/2019-31/05/2021 : Lecturer / teaching staff member – Deutsche Angestellten Akademie
- 01/06/2021-31/12/2022 : Online editor – Sygnal42 GmbH & Co. KG (freelance)
- 01/10/2022-30/04/2024 : Head of Marketing & HR – Etgeton Automationstechnik GmbH & Co. KG (part time)
- 01/12/2019- ... : Property manager – Biobilie Ökologische Immobilienverwaltung
- 01/01/2021- ... : Founder of the sustainable company ‘Better World Machines’
Political career
- 05/09/2022- ... : Chairman of the North Rhine-Westphalia regional association ‘Mensch Umwelt Tierschutz’ (Animal Welfare Party)
Honours
- 2021 – ‘Project Sustainability’ award from the German Council for Sustainable Development (RNE) for the nationwide bee vending machine project