Eva-Riitta SIITONEN
Constituencies
Show earlier Constituencies...
- Kansallinen Kokoomus Finland 2009/01/01 - 2009/07/13
Groups
Show earlier Groups...
- PPE-DE Member Group of the European People's Party (Christian Democrats) and European Democrats 2009/01/01 - 2009/07/13
Committees
Show earlier committees...
Role | Committee | Start | End |
---|---|---|---|
Substitute of | Committee on Economic and Monetary Affairs | 2009/01/13 | 2009/07/13 |
Member of | Committee on Legal Affairs | 2009/01/14 | 2009/07/13 |
Member of | Committee on Women's Rights and Gender Equality | 2009/01/14 | 2009/07/13 |
Delegations
Show earlier delegations...
Role | Delegation | Start | End |
---|---|---|---|
Substitute of | Delegation for relations with the United States | 2009/01/13 | 2009/07/13 |
Member of | Delegation for relations with the People's Republic of China | 2009/01/14 | 2009/07/13 |
Rapporteur
Type | Dossier | Committee | Title |
---|---|---|---|
Committee Opinion | 2008/0215(CNS) | JURI Legal Affairs | Taxation of savings income in the form of interest payments |
Activities
Stats
Amendment Co-authors
Name | Group | Country | Ams |
---|---|---|---|
Sirpa PIETIKÄINEN | PPE-DE | Finland | 4 |
By types
Amendments (8)Opinions (1)
Plenary speeches (2)
By dossiers
Count | Dossier Reference | Title |
8 | 2008/0215(CNS) | Taxation of savings income in the form of interest payments |
1 | 2008/0195(COD) | Organisation of working time: persons performing mobile road transport activities |
1 | 2008/0228(CNS) | Value added tax (VAT): combating tax evasion linked to imports |
See historical changes of the Bio
Born
1940/05/31 - Helsinki- Master's degree in business studies (1979), graduate of commercial institute (1974).
- City of Helsinki (1960-1971). Private entrepreneur (1974-1983). Finnish television (MTV) (1975-1983). Member of the Finnish Parliament (1983-1989). Governor of the Province of Uusimaa (1990-1996). Mayor of Helsinki (1996-2005). Member of the European Parliament (since 2009).
- Deputy leader, Kokoomus party, in the Finnish Parliament (1987-1989).
- Member, Helsinki City Council (1981-1989). Member, Helsinki City Executive (1985-1989). Vice-chair and Chair, Helsinki and Helsinki University Advisory Board (1996-2005).
- Chair, Educational and Cultural Activities Board (1981-1983). Member, Capital Region Cooperation Delegation (1981-1989).
- Member, electoral college for the President (1982, 1988). Substitute member, Education Committee, Finnish Parliament (1983-1987). Member, Grand Committee, Finnish Parliament (1983-1987). Member, Legislation Committee, Finnish Parliament (1983-1987). Member, Finance Committee, Finnish Parliament (1987-1989). Substitute member, State auditors (1987-1990). Vice-chair, auditors of the Finnish Parliament (1984-1991).
- Member of the Bureau, Committee of the Regions (1998-2001). Member, Committee of the Regions (1998-2006).
- Baltic Sea States Subregional Cooperation, Member of the working group (1994-1996). Assembly of European Regions (AER), Member of the Bureau (1995-1996). Vice-chair, Eurocities organisation (1998-2000). Chair, Eurocities organisation (2000-2002).
- Member, Governing Board, Finnish Broadcasting Corporation (1987-1991), Helsinki Cooperative Retail Society, Vice-chair of Administrative Council (1987-2007), National Consumer Administration, Member of the Board of Directors (1992-1996), National Board of Metropolitan, Member of the Board of Directors (1996-2004), Lord Mayor of Helsinki. Knight Commander's Order of the White Rose of Finland. Gold Cross of the Police. Honorary doctorate, Veterinary College. Honorary doctorate, Helsinki School of Economics.
Eva-Riitta SIITONEN on
History
(these mark the time of scraping, not the official date of the change)
2013-07-21Show (1) Changes
CV |
|