Alessandra MUSSOLINI
Constituencies
- Independent Italy 2018/09/04 -
Show earlier Constituencies...
- Forza Italia Italy 2014/07/01 - 2018/09/03
- Alternativa sociale: Lista Mussolini Italy 2004/07/20 - 2008/04/28
Groups
- PPE Member Group of the European People's Party (Christian Democrats) 2016/12/12 -
Show earlier Groups...
- ['NA', 'NI'] Member Non-attached Members 2016/11/30 - 2016/12/11
- PPE Member Group of the European People's Party (Christian Democrats) 2014/07/01 - 2016/11/29
- ['NA', 'NI'] Member Non-attached Members 2007/11/14 - 2008/04/28
- ITS Member of the Bureau Identity, Tradition and Sovereignty Group 2007/01/15 - 2007/11/13
- ['NA', 'NI'] Member Non-attached Members 2004/07/20 - 2007/01/14
Committees
Role | Committee | Start | End |
---|---|---|---|
Member of | Committee on Civil Liberties, Justice and Home Affairs | 2017/01/19 | |
Substitute of | Committee on Employment and Social Affairs | 2017/01/19 | |
Substitute of | Committee on the Internal Market and Consumer Protection | 2017/01/19 | |
Substitute of | Committee on Women's Rights and Gender Equality | 2017/01/19 |
Show earlier committees...
Role | Committee | Start | End |
---|---|---|---|
Substitute of | Committee on the Environment, Public Health and Food Safety | 2017/01/12 | 2017/01/18 |
Substitute of | Committee on Women's Rights and Gender Equality | 2017/01/12 | 2017/01/18 |
Member of | Committee on Civil Liberties, Justice and Home Affairs | 2014/07/14 | 2017/01/18 |
Substitute of | Committee on the Environment, Public Health and Food Safety | 2014/07/01 | 2016/11/30 |
Substitute of | Committee on Women's Rights and Gender Equality | 2014/07/01 | 2016/11/30 |
Member of | Committee on Transport and Tourism | 2014/07/01 | 2014/07/13 |
Member of | Committee on Civil Liberties, Justice and Home Affairs | 2007/01/31 | 2008/04/28 |
Substitute of | Committee on Development | 2007/01/31 | 2008/04/28 |
Member of | Committee on Civil Liberties, Justice and Home Affairs | 2007/01/15 | 2007/01/30 |
Member of | Committee on Civil Liberties, Justice and Home Affairs | 2004/07/21 | 2007/01/14 |
Substitute of | Committee on Development | 2004/07/21 | 2007/01/14 |
Delegations
Role | Delegation | Start | End |
---|---|---|---|
Member of | Delegation to the ACP-EU Joint Parliamentary Assembly | 2014/07/14 |
Show earlier delegations...
Role | Delegation | Start | End |
---|---|---|---|
Substitute of | Delegation for relations with India | 2014/07/14 | 2016/11/30 |
Member of | Delegation for relations with Belarus | 2007/03/15 | 2008/04/28 |
Substitute of | Delegation to the EU-Russia Parliamentary Cooperation Committee | 2007/03/15 | 2008/04/28 |
Member of | Delegation for relations with the Mashreq countries | 2007/03/14 | 2007/03/14 |
Member of | Delegation to the Euro-Mediterranean Parliamentary Assembly | 2004/09/15 | 2008/04/28 |
Member of | Delegation for relations with the Mashreq countries | 2004/09/15 | 2007/03/13 |
Contact
Homepage
- [javascript protected email address]
Brussels
- Phone: +322 28 45521
- Fax: +322 28 49521
- Office: Bât. Altiero Spinelli 10E261
- Full Address
- City: Bruxelles/Brussel
- Zip: B-1047
- Street: 60, rue Wiertz / Wiertzstraat 60
Strasbourg
- Phone: +333 88 1 75521
- Fax: +333 88 1 79521
- Office: Bât. Louise Weiss T10050
- Full Address
- City: Strasbourg
- Zip: CS 91024 - F-67070
- Street: 1, avenue du Président Robert Schuman
Postal
- European Parliament
- Rue Wiertz
- Altiero Spinelli 10E261
- 1047 Brussels
Rapporteur
Type | Dossier | Committee | Title |
---|---|---|---|
Responsible Committee Shadow | 2023/2028(INI) | LIBE Civil Liberties, Justice and Home Affairs | Situation of fundamental rights in the European Union - annual report 2022 and 2023 |
Responsible Committee Shadow | 2023/0450(NLE) | INTA International Trade | EU/Japan Economic Partnership Agreement: free flow of data |
Responsible Committee | 2023/0338(NLE) | INTA International Trade | EU/Kenya Economic Partnership Agreement |
Responsible Committee Shadow | 2018/0153(COD) | LIBE Civil Liberties, Justice and Home Affairs | European network of immigration liaison officers. Recast |
Responsible Committee | 2015/0809(CNS) | LIBE Civil Liberties, Justice and Home Affairs | Agreement on strategic cooperation in the fight against serious crime and terrorism between the United Arab Emirates and European Police Office (Europol) |
Responsible Committee Shadow | 2015/0306(COD) | LIBE Civil Liberties, Justice and Home Affairs | European travel document for the return of illegally staying third-country nationals |
Activities
Stats
Amendment Co-authors
Name | Group | Country | Ams |
---|---|---|---|
Barbara MATERA | PPE | Italy | 311 |
Salvatore Domenico POGLIESE | PPE | Italy | 290 |
Monika HOHLMEIER | PPE | Germany | 147 |
József NAGY | PPE | Slovakia | 116 |
Elisabetta GARDINI | PPE | Italy | 115 |
Tomáš ZDECHOVSKÝ | PPE | Czechia | 111 |
Csaba SÓGOR | PPE | Romania | 104 |
Frank ENGEL | PPE | Luxembourg | 100 |
Anna Maria CORAZZA BILDT | PPE | Sweden | 98 |
Rachida DATI | PPE | France | 94 |
Traian UNGUREANU | PPE | Romania | 86 |
Aldo PATRICIELLO | PPE | Italy | 80 |
Pál CSÁKY | PPE | Slovakia | 78 |
Brice HORTEFEUX | PPE | France | 78 |
Roberta METSOLA | PPE | Malta | 73 |
Lara COMI | PPE | Italy | 70 |
Carlos COELHO | PPE | Portugal | 70 |
Elissavet VOZEMBERG-VRIONIDI | PPE | Greece | 68 |
Jeroen LENAERS | PPE | Netherlands | 67 |
Agustín DÍAZ DE MERA GARCÍA CONSUEGRA | PPE | Spain | 65 |
Jörgen WARBORN | PPE | Sweden | 65 |
Liudas MAŽYLIS | PPE | Lithuania | 65 |
Iuliu WINKLER | PPE | Romania | 65 |
Daniel CASPARY | PPE | Germany | 65 |
Anna-Michelle ASIMAKOPOULOU | PPE | Greece | 65 |
Axel VOSS | PPE | Germany | 64 |
Esteban GONZÁLEZ PONS | PPE | Spain | 64 |
Angelika WINZIG | PPE | Austria | 64 |
Nadine MORANO | PPE | France | 63 |
Christophe HANSEN | PPE | Luxembourg | 63 |
Gabriel MATO | PPE | Spain | 63 |
Andrey KOVATCHEV | PPE | Bulgaria | 63 |
Stefano MAULLU | PPE | Italy | 62 |
Mariya GABRIEL | PPE | Bulgaria | 62 |
Krzysztof HETMAN | PPE | Poland | 62 |
Romana TOMC | PPE | Slovenia | 62 |
Alberto CIRIO | PPE | Italy | 61 |
Teresa JIMÉNEZ-BECERRIL BARRIO | PPE | Spain | 60 |
Nuno MELO | PPE | Portugal | 60 |
Arba KOKALARI | PPE | Sweden | 60 |
Andreas SCHWAB | PPE | Germany | 59 |
Kinga GÁL | PPE | Hungary | 58 |
Salvatore CICU | PPE | Italy | 54 |
Massimiliano SALINI | PPE | Italy | 54 |
Heinz K. BECKER | PPE | Austria | 47 |
Artis PABRIKS | PPE | Latvia | 46 |
Marion WALSMANN | PPE | Germany | 44 |
Michał BONI | PPE | Poland | 37 |
Arnaud DANJEAN | PPE | France | 32 |
Seán KELLY | PPE | Ireland | 28 |
Emil RADEV | PPE | Bulgaria | 25 |
Petri SARVAMAA | PPE | Finland | 24 |
Giovanni LA VIA | PPE | Italy | 18 |
Caterina CHINNICI | S&D | Italy | 17 |
Antonio LÓPEZ-ISTÚRIZ WHITE | PPE | Spain | 17 |
Luigi MORGANO | S&D | Italy | 16 |
Nathalie GRIESBECK | ALDE | France | 15 |
Alojz PETERLE | PPE | Slovenia | 12 |
Michela GIUFFRIDA | S&D | Italy | 12 |
Damiano ZOFFOLI | S&D | Italy | 11 |
Hilde VAUTMANS | ALDE | Belgium | 11 |
Julie WARD | S&D | United Kingdom | 11 |
Agnieszka KOZŁOWSKA | PPE | Poland | 11 |
Cristian-Silviu BUŞOI | PPE | Romania | 10 |
Silvia COSTA | S&D | Italy | 10 |
Andrea BOCSKOR | PPE | Hungary | 10 |
Fulvio MARTUSCIELLO | PPE | Italy | 9 |
Simona BONAFÈ | S&D | Italy | 9 |
Constance LE GRIP | PPE | France | 9 |
Milan ZVER | PPE | Slovenia | 8 |
Jana ŽITŇANSKÁ | ECR | Slovakia | 7 |
Lorenzo CESA | PPE | Italy | 5 |
Antonio TAJANI | PPE | Italy | 4 |
Petr JEŽEK | ALDE | Czechia | 4 |
Beatriz BECERRA BASTERRECHEA | ALDE | Spain | 4 |
Gérard DEPREZ | ALDE | Belgium | 4 |
Françoise GROSSETÊTE | PPE | France | 3 |
Miriam DALLI | S&D | Malta | 3 |
Marielle DE SARNEZ | ALDE | France | 3 |
Miapetra KUMPULA-NATRI | S&D | Finland | 3 |
Herbert DORFMANN | PPE | Italy | 2 |
Raffaele FITTO | ECR | Italy | 1 |
Remo SERNAGIOTTO | ECR | Italy | 1 |
Innocenzo LEONTINI | PPE | Italy | 1 |
Vilija BLINKEVIČIŪTĖ | S&D | Lithuania | 1 |
Brando BENIFEI | S&D | Italy | 1 |
Barbara KUDRYCKA | PPE | Poland | 1 |
Filiz HYUSMENOVA | ALDE | Bulgaria | 1 |
By types
Amendments (536)Individual motions (1)
Plenary speeches (6)
Reports (1)
Shadow reports (2)
Written questions (10)
By dossiers
Count | Dossier Reference | Title |
65 | 2022/0269(COD) | Prohibiting products made with forced labour on the Union market |
64 | 2011/0023(COD) | Use of passenger name record (PNR) data for the prevention, detection, investigation and prosecution of terrorist offences and serious crime |
45 | 2016/0133(COD) | Criteria and mechanisms for determining the Member State responsible for examining an application for international protection lodged in one of the Member States by a third-country national or a stateless person. Recast |
36 | 2015/2254(INL) | Establishment of an EU mechanism on democracy, the rule of law and fundamental rights |
34 | 2016/0223(COD) | Qualification Directive |
29 | 2015/2095(INI) | Situation in the Mediterranean and need for a holistic EU approach to migration |
29 | 2014/2215(INI) | Special report of the European Ombudsman in own-initiative inquiry OI/5/2012/BEH-MHZ concerning Frontex |
26 | 2017/0353(COD) | Compliance with and enforcement of Union harmonisation legislation on products |
24 | 2017/0354(COD) | Mutual recognition of goods lawfully marketed in another Member State |
21 | 2014/2254(INI) | Situation of fundamental rights in the European Union (2013-2014) |
19 | 2018/0153(COD) | European network of immigration liaison officers. Recast |
18 | 2016/0222(COD) | Reception Conditions Directive |
16 | 2016/2057(INI) | EU options for improving access to medicines |
13 | 2016/0224(COD) | Asylum Procedure Regulation |
13 | 2015/2063(INI) | Prevention of radicalisation and recruitment of European citizens by terrorist organisations |
11 | 2015/0306(COD) | European travel document for the return of illegally staying third-country nationals |
9 | 2015/2342(INI) | Addressing refugee and migrant movements: the role of EU External Action |
7 | 2017/0085(COD) | Work-life balance for parents and carers |
7 | 2017/2003(INI) | European agenda for the collaborative economy |
6 | 2016/2009(INI) | Situation of fundamental rights in the European Union in 2015 |
6 | 2015/0310(COD) | European Border and Coast Guard |
5 | 2016/0089(NLE) | Provisional measures in the area of international protection for the benefit of Italy and Greece: relocation of applicants |
5 | 2022/0155(COD) | Combating child sexual abuse online |
4 | 2016/0131(COD) | European Union Agency for Asylum |
4 | 2015/0269(COD) | Control of the acquisition and possession of weapons |
4 | 2023/2028(INI) | Situation of fundamental rights in the European Union - annual report 2022 and 2023 |
3 | 2018/0227(COD) | Digital Europe programme 2021–2027 |
3 | 2015/2287(INI) | Public access to documents (Rule 116(7)) for the years 2014-2015 |
3 | 2015/0125(NLE) | International protection: provisional measures for the benefit of Italy and Greece |
2 | 2017/0328(COD) | European Medicines Agency (EMA): location of the seat |
2 | 2016/2010(INI) | Application of the Postal Services Directive |
1 | 2015/0218(COD) | Emergency autonomous trade measures for Tunisia |
1 | 2016/0151(COD) | Audiovisual media services: changing market realities |
1 | 2018/0330(COD) | European Border and Coast Guard |
1 | 2015/0281(COD) | Combating terrorism |
1 | 2023/0338(NLE) | EU/Kenya Economic Partnership Agreement |
1 | 2023/0450(NLE) | EU/Japan Economic Partnership Agreement: free flow of data |
See historical changes of the Bio
Born
1962/12/30 - RomaEducation (qualifications and diplomas)
- 1994-1994 : University, Medicine: Honours degree in medicine and surgery;
- 2012-2012 : Licensed to practise medicine
Political career
- 1992-2000 : Member of the policy bureau of MSI (Movimento Sociale Italiano)
- 2000-2003 : Member of the policy bureau of 'Alleanza Nazionale'
- 2004-2008 : Political Secretary of 'Alternativa Sociale'
- 2004-2008 : National Secretary of 'Azione Sociale'
- 2009- ... : Member of the national leadership of 'Forza Italia'
- 2010-2010 : Campania – Member of regional council
- 2004-2008 : Member of the European Parliament
- 2014- ... : Member of the European Parliament
Alessandra MUSSOLINI on
History
(these mark the time of scraping, not the official date of the change)
2019-03-18Show (76) Changes | Timetravel
Addresses/Postal address |
|
CV/updated |
2015-03-03T00:00:00
|
Committees/0/committee_id |
LIBE
|
Committees/0/term |
8
|
Committees/1/committee_id |
EMPL
|
Committees/1/term |
8
|
Committees/2/committee_id |
IMCO
|
Committees/2/term |
8
|
Committees/3/committee_id |
FEMM
|
Committees/3/term |
8
|
Committees/4 |
|
Committees/4 |
|
Committees/4/committee_id |
ENVI
|
Committees/4/term |
8
|
Committees/5 |
|
Committees/5 |
|
Committees/5/committee_id |
FEMM
|
Committees/5/term |
8
|
Committees/6 |
|
Committees/6 |
|
Committees/6/committee_id |
LIBE
|
Committees/6/term |
8
|
Committees/7/committee_id |
ENVI
|
Committees/7/term |
8
|
Committees/8/committee_id |
FEMM
|
Committees/8/term |
8
|
Committees/9/committee_id |
TRAN
|
Committees/9/term |
8
|
Committees/10/committee_id |
LIBE
|
Committees/10/term |
6
|
Committees/11/committee_id |
DEVE
|
Committees/11/term |
6
|
Committees/12/committee_id |
LIBE
|
Committees/12/term |
6
|
Committees/13/committee_id |
LIBE
|
Committees/13/term |
6
|
Committees/14/committee_id |
DEVE
|
Committees/14/term |
6
|
Constituencies/0/term |
8
|
Constituencies/1/term |
8
|
Constituencies/2/term |
6
|
Declarations of Participation |
|
Delegations/0/abbr |
DACP
|
Delegations/0/term |
8
|
Delegations/1/abbr |
D-IN
|
Delegations/1/term |
8
|
Delegations/2 |
|
Delegations/2 |
|
Delegations/2/abbr |
D-BY
|
Delegations/2/term |
6
|
Delegations/3 |
|
Delegations/3 |
|
Delegations/3/abbr |
D-RU
|
Delegations/3/term |
6
|
Delegations/4 |
|
Delegations/4 |
|
Delegations/4/abbr |
DMAS
|
Delegations/4/term |
6
|
Delegations/5 |
|
Delegations/5 |
|
Delegations/5/abbr |
|
Delegations/5/term |
6
|
Delegations/6/abbr |
DMAS
|
Delegations/6/term |
6
|
Groups/0/country |
Italy
|
Groups/1/country |
Italy
|
Groups/2/country |
Italy
|
Groups/3/country |
Italy
|
Groups/4/country |
Italy
|
Groups/5/country |
Italy
|
Name/familylc |
mussolini
|
assistants/accredited/0 |
Old
Andrea Lorenza PRINCIPI NININew
Giuliana CICCARELLI |
assistants/accredited/1 |
Massimo TAMBLE
|
assistants/local/0 |
Old
MACCHIONI MONICANew
Andrea Lorenza PRINCIPI NINI |
assistants/paying agents |
|
assistants/service providers |
|
2018-11-02Show (1) Changes | Timetravel
assistants/local/0 |
Chiara Silvia Maria CESANA
|
2018-10-05Show (3) Changes | Timetravel
assistants/accredited/0 |
Old
MACCHIONI MONICANew
Andrea Lorenza PRINCIPI NINI |
assistants/accredited/0 |
Chiara Silvia Maria CESANA
|
assistants/local |
|
2018-10-01Show (1) Changes | Timetravel
assistants/paying agents |
|
2018-09-29Show (1) Changes | Timetravel
assistants/paying agents/0 |
Old
Andrea Lorenza NININew
Andrea Lorenza PRINCIPI NINI |
2018-09-13Show (2) Changes | Timetravel
Constituencies/0 |
|
Constituencies/1/end |
Old
9999-12-31T00:00:00New
2018-09-03T00:00:00 |
2018-08-04Show (3) Changes | Timetravel
assistants/accredited/0 |
Old
Alessio CONTINew
Chiara Silvia Maria CESANA |
assistants/accredited/1 |
Old
Marco CAVARISCHINew
MACCHIONI MONICA |
assistants/local |
|
2018-07-12Show (1) Changes | Timetravel
assistants/paying agents |
|
2018-04-07Show (1) Changes | Timetravel
assistants/local/1 |
MACCHIONI MONICA
|
2017-11-21Show (2) Changes | Timetravel
assistants/local/0 |
Old
LEONARDO CONSULTING SRLNew
Chiara Silvia Maria CESANA |
assistants/service providers |
|
2017-11-08Show (2) Changes | Timetravel
assistants/local/0 |
Old
Alessio CUOMONew
LEONARDO CONSULTING SRL |
assistants/service providers |
|
2017-09-29Show (1) Changes | Timetravel
CV |
Old
New
|
2017-07-07Show (1) Changes | Timetravel
Financial Declarations/2 |
|
2017-06-29Show (3) Changes | Timetravel
|
|
Homepage |
|
assistants/accredited/0 |
Jair Cadena Rivera
|
2017-02-23Show (2) Changes | Timetravel
Committees/5/end |
Old
9999-12-31T00:00:00New
2017-01-18T00:00:00 |
Committees/6/end |
Old
9999-12-31T00:00:00New
2017-01-18T00:00:00 |
2017-01-25Show (4) Changes | Timetravel
Committees/0 |
|
Committees/3 |
|
Committees/4 |
|
Committees/5 |
|
2017-01-17Show (3) Changes | Timetravel
Committees/0 |
|
Committees/1 |
|
Committees/2/end |
Old
9999-12-31T00:00:00New
2017-01-18T00:00:00 |
2016-12-17Show (2) Changes | Timetravel
Groups/0 |
|
Groups/1/end |
Old
9999-12-31T00:00:00New
2016-12-11T00:00:00 |
2016-12-05Show (9) Changes | Timetravel
Committees/1/end |
Old
9999-12-31T00:00:00New
2016-11-30T00:00:00 |
Committees/2/end |
Old
9999-12-31T00:00:00New
2016-11-30T00:00:00 |
Delegations/1/end |
Old
9999-12-31T00:00:00New
2016-11-30T00:00:00 |
Groups/0 |
|
Groups/1/end |
Old
9999-12-31T00:00:00New
2016-11-29T00:00:00 |
assistants/accredited/0 |
Old
CAVARISCHI MarcoNew
Jair Cadena Rivera |
assistants/accredited/1 |
Old
Cadena Rivera JairNew
Marco CAVARISCHI |
assistants/accredited/2 |
Old
CONTI AlessioNew
Alessio CONTI |
assistants/local/0 |
Old
CUOMO AlessioNew
Alessio CUOMO |
2016-06-21Show (1) Changes | Timetravel
assistants/local/0 |
CONTI Eleonora
|
2016-04-28Show (1) Changes | Timetravel
assistants/accredited |
|
2016-04-16Show (1) Changes | Timetravel
assistants/accredited |
|
2016-04-13Show (1) Changes | Timetravel
assistants/accredited/0 |
Cadena Rivera Jair
|
2016-04-04Show (1) Changes | Timetravel
assistants/accredited |
|
2016-03-18Show (1) Changes | Timetravel
assistants/accredited |
|
2016-03-05Show (1) Changes | Timetravel
Financial Declarations/1/occupation/1 |
|
2016-02-27Show (1) Changes | Timetravel
assistants |
|
2016-02-06Show (2) Changes | Timetravel
Financial Declarations/1 |
|
assistants |
|
2015-12-06Show (1) Changes | Timetravel
assistants/accredited/0 |
CICCARELLI Giuliana
|
2015-10-28Show (1) Changes | Timetravel
assistants/local/2 |
JAIR Cadena Rivera
|
2015-03-12Show (1) Changes | Timetravel
Declarations of Participation |
|
2015-02-14Show (1) Changes | Timetravel
Addresses/Brussels |
|
2015-02-05Show (2) Changes | Timetravel
|
|
|
2015-01-26Show (1) Changes | Timetravel
Addresses/Brussels |
|
2014-11-02Show (4) Changes | Timetravel
Addresses/Brussels/Fax |
+322 28 49521
|
Addresses/Brussels/Phone |
+322 28 45521
|
Addresses/Strasbourg/Fax |
+333 88 1 79521
|
Addresses/Strasbourg/Phone |
+333 88 1 75521
|
2014-10-22Show (4) Changes | Timetravel
Addresses/Brussels/Fax |
+322 28 49521
|
Addresses/Brussels/Phone |
+322 28 45521
|
Addresses/Strasbourg/Fax |
+333 88 1 79521
|
Addresses/Strasbourg/Phone |
+333 88 1 75521
|
2014-09-07Show (1) Changes | Timetravel
Financial Declarations/0/url |
Old
http://www.europarl.europa.eu/mepdif/28429_DFI_rev0_IT.pdfNew
http://www.europarl.europa.eu/mepdif/28429_DFI_rev0_IT.pdf |
2014-09-06Show (1) Changes | Timetravel
Financial Declarations/0/url |
Old
http://www.europarl.europa.eu/mepdif/28429_DFI_rev0_IT.pdfNew
http://www.europarl.europa.eu/mepdif/28429_DFI_rev0_IT.pdf |
2014-09-05Show (1) Changes | Timetravel
Financial Declarations/0/url |
Old
http://www.europarl.europa.eu/mepdif/28429_DFI_rev0_IT.pdfNew
http://www.europarl.europa.eu/mepdif/28429_DFI_rev0_IT.pdf |
2014-09-04Show (1) Changes | Timetravel
Financial Declarations/0/url |
Old
http://www.europarl.europa.eu/mepdif/28429_DFI_rev0_IT.pdfNew
http://www.europarl.europa.eu/mepdif/28429_DFI_rev0_IT.pdf |
2014-09-03Show (1) Changes | Timetravel
Financial Declarations/0/url |
Old
http://www.europarl.europa.eu/mepdif/28429_DFI_rev0_IT.pdfNew
http://www.europarl.europa.eu/mepdif/28429_DFI_rev0_IT.pdf |
2014-09-02Show (1) Changes | Timetravel
Financial Declarations/0/url |
Old
http://www.europarl.europa.eu/mepdif/28429_DFI_rev0_IT.pdfNew
http://www.europarl.europa.eu/mepdif/28429_DFI_rev0_IT.pdf |
2014-09-02Show (2) Changes | Timetravel
Financial Declarations/0/date |
16/06/2014
|
Financial Declarations/0/url |
http://www.europarl.europa.eu/mepdif/28429_DFI_rev0_IT.pdf
|
2014-08-27Show (1) Changes | Timetravel
assistants/local/2 |
JAIR Cadena Rivera
|
2014-08-07Show (1) Changes | Timetravel
assistants/accredited |
|
2014-07-29Show (5) Changes | Timetravel
Constituencies/0/country |
Italy
|
Constituencies/0/party |
Old
Forza Italia (Italy)New
Forza Italia |
Constituencies/1/country |
Italy
|
Constituencies/1/party |
Old
Alternativa sociale: Lista Mussolini (Italy)New
Alternativa sociale: Lista Mussolini |
Financial Declarations |
|
2014-07-27Show (17) Changes | Timetravel
CV/0 |
Graduate in medicine and surgery (1993).
|
CV/1 |
Member of the Executive of Alleanza National (1992); National Secretary of the party 'Libertà di Azione' (2003).
|
CV/2 |
Member of the Italian Chamber of Deputies (1992), vice-chairman of the Committee on Social Affairs (since 1994).
|
CV/3 |
Honorary Member of the Italian Red Cross.
|
Committees/0 |
|
Committees/3/end |
Old
9999-12-31T00:00:00New
2014-07-13T00:00:00 |
Constituencies/0/country |
Italy
|
Constituencies/0/party |
Old
Forza ItaliaNew
Forza Italia (Italy) |
Constituencies/1/country |
Italy
|
Constituencies/1/party |
Old
Alternativa sociale: Lista MussoliniNew
Alternativa sociale: Lista Mussolini (Italy) |
Delegations/0 |
|
Delegations/1 |
|
Groups/0/country |
Italy
|
Groups/1/country |
Italy
|
Groups/2/country |
Italy
|
Groups/3/country |
Italy
|
assistants |
|
2014-07-09Show (1) Changes | Timetravel
Addresses/Postal/2 |
Old
Altiero SpinelliNew
Altiero Spinelli 10E261 |
2014-07-07Show (5) Changes | Timetravel
Addresses |
|
Committees/0 |
|
Committees/1 |
|
Committees/2 |
|
Groups/0 |
|
2014-07-01Show (3) Changes | Timetravel
Constituencies/0 |
|
|
|
active |
Old
New
True |
2013-07-21Show (11) Changes
Birth |
|
CV |
|
Committees |
|
Constituencies |
|
Delegations |
|
Gender |
F
|
Groups |
|
Name |
|
Photo |
http://www.europarl.europa.eu/mepphoto/28429.jpg
|
UserID |
28429
|
active |
False
|