Niels FUGLSANG
Constituencies
- Socialdemokratiet Denmark 2024/07/16 -
Show earlier Constituencies...
- Socialdemokratiet Denmark 2019/07/02 - 2024/07/15
Groups
- S&D Member Group of the Progressive Alliance of Socialists and Democrats in the European Parliament 2024/07/16 -
Show earlier Groups...
- S&D Member Group of the Progressive Alliance of Socialists and Democrats in the European Parliament 2019/07/02 - 2024/07/15
Committees
Role | Committee | Start | End |
---|---|---|---|
Substitute of | Committee on Economic and Monetary Affairs | 2024/07/19 | |
Member of | Committee on Industry, Research and Energy | 2024/07/19 | |
Member of | Subcommittee on Tax Matters | 2024/07/19 |
Show earlier committees...
Role | Committee | Start | End |
---|---|---|---|
Substitute of | Committee on Transport and Tourism | 2019/07/02 | 2019/09/04 |
Member of | Committee on Employment and Social Affairs | 2019/07/02 | 2019/09/15 |
Substitute of | Committee on Economic and Monetary Affairs | 2019/07/02 | 2022/01/19 |
Member of | Committee on Industry, Research and Energy | 2019/07/02 | 2022/01/19 |
Substitute of | Committee of Inquiry on the Protection of Animals during Transport | 2020/06/19 | 2021/12/19 |
Substitute of | Subcommittee on Tax Matters | 2020/09/14 | 2022/01/19 |
Substitute of | Committee on Economic and Monetary Affairs | 2022/01/20 | 2024/07/15 |
Member of | Committee on Industry, Research and Energy | 2022/01/20 | 2024/07/15 |
Substitute of | Subcommittee on Tax Matters | 2022/01/20 | 2024/07/15 |
Delegations
Role | Delegation | Start | End |
---|---|---|---|
Member of | Delegation for relations with the Arab Peninsula | 2024/09/19 | |
Substitute of | Delegation for relations with the People's Republic of China | 2024/09/19 |
Show earlier delegations...
Role | Delegation | Start | End |
---|---|---|---|
Substitute of | Delegation for relations with the countries of Southeast Asia and the Association of Southeast Asian Nations (ASEAN) | 2019/07/02 | 2019/09/04 |
Member of | Delegation for relations with the Korean Peninsula | 2019/07/02 | 2019/09/15 |
Member of | Delegation for relations with the People's Republic of China | 2019/07/02 | 2024/07/15 |
Substitute of | Delegation to the EU-Türkiye Joint Parliamentary Committee | 2019/07/02 | 2024/07/15 |
Member of | Delegation for relations with the Arab Peninsula | 2023/04/17 | 2023/05/03 |
Vice-Chair of | Delegation for relations with the Arab Peninsula | 2023/05/04 | 2024/07/15 |
Contact
- [javascript protected email address]
Brussels
- Phone: 003222845420
- Fax:
- Office: Bât. ALTIERO SPINELLI 11G154
- Full Address
- City: Bruxelles/Brussel
- Zip: B-1047
- Street: 60, rue Wiertz / Wiertzstraat 60
Strasbourg
- Phone: 0033388175420
- Fax:
- Office: Bât. LOUISE WEISS T05053
- Full Address
- City: Strasbourg
- Zip: CS 91024 - F-67070
- Street: 1, avenue du Président Robert Schuman
Rapporteur
Type | Dossier | Committee | Title |
---|---|---|---|
Responsible Committee Shadow | 2023/2111(INI) | ITRE Industry, Research and Energy | Geothermal energy |
Responsible Committee | 2022/2080(INI) | ECON Economic and Monetary Affairs | Lessons learnt from the Pandora Papers and other revelations |
Responsible Committee Shadow | 2021/2077(INI) | ITRE Industry, Research and Energy | Implementation of the Energy Performance of Buildings Directive |
Responsible Committee Shadow | 2021/2074(INI) | ECON Economic and Monetary Affairs | The impact of national tax reforms on the EU economy |
Responsible Committee Shadow | 2021/2012(INI) | ITRE Industry, Research and Energy | A European strategy for offshore renewable energy |
Responsible Committee Shadow | 2021/2010(INI) | ECON Economic and Monetary Affairs | Digital taxation: OECD negotiations, tax residency of digital companies and a possible European Digital Tax |
Responsible Committee | 2021/0203(COD) | ITRE Industry, Research and Energy | Energy Efficiency Directive |
Responsible Committee Shadow | 2020/0268(COD) | ECON Economic and Monetary Affairs | Digital Finance: amending Directive regarding Digital Operational Resilience requirements |
Responsible Committee Shadow | 2019/2189(INI) | ITRE Industry, Research and Energy | A comprehensive European approach to energy storage |
Activities
Stats
Amendment Co-authors
Name | Group | Country | Ams |
---|---|---|---|
Carlos ZORRINHO | S&D | Portugal | 795 |
Robert HAJŠEL | S&D | Slovakia | 673 |
Nicolás GONZÁLEZ CASARES | S&D | Spain | 533 |
Miapetra KUMPULA-NATRI | S&D | Finland | 457 |
Lina GÁLVEZ | S&D | Spain | 430 |
Paul TANG | S&D | Netherlands | 397 |
Aurore LALUCQ | S&D | France | 391 |
Pedro MARQUES | S&D | Portugal | 368 |
Adriana MALDONADO LÓPEZ | S&D | Spain | 347 |
Jonás FERNÁNDEZ | S&D | Spain | 344 |
Dan NICA | S&D | Romania | 296 |
Patrizia TOIA | S&D | Italy | 285 |
Tsvetelina PENKOVA | S&D | Bulgaria | 276 |
Marek Paweł BALT | S&D | Poland | 226 |
Łukasz KOHUT | S&D | Poland | 209 |
Marcos ROS SEMPERE | S&D | Spain | 208 |
Csaba MOLNÁR | S&D | Hungary | 203 |
Evelyn REGNER | S&D | Austria | 184 |
Joachim SCHUSTER | S&D | Germany | 179 |
Romana JERKOVIĆ | S&D | Croatia | 177 |
Jens GEIER | S&D | Germany | 167 |
Maria-Manuel LEITÃO-MARQUES | S&D | Portugal | 159 |
Josianne CUTAJAR | S&D | Malta | 156 |
Alicia HOMS GINEL | S&D | Spain | 145 |
Erik BERGKVIST | S&D | Sweden | 140 |
Eva KAILI | S&D | Greece | 119 |
Marek BELKA | S&D | Poland | 105 |
Eero HEINÄLUOMA | S&D | Finland | 92 |
Alfred SANT | S&D | Malta | 84 |
Margarida MARQUES | S&D | Portugal | 84 |
Mohammed CHAHIM | S&D | Netherlands | 80 |
Pedro SILVA PEREIRA | S&D | Portugal | 63 |
Beatrice COVASSI | S&D | Italy | 59 |
Monika BEŇOVÁ | S&D | Slovakia | 56 |
René REPASI | S&D | Germany | 55 |
Marc ANGEL | S&D | Luxembourg | 47 |
Ivo HRISTOV | S&D | Bulgaria | 42 |
Andris AMERIKS | S&D | Latvia | 42 |
Maria NOICHL | S&D | Germany | 35 |
Cyrus ENGERER | S&D | Malta | 29 |
Elisabetta GUALMINI | S&D | Italy | 23 |
Carmen AVRAM | S&D | Romania | 22 |
Simona BONAFÈ | S&D | Italy | 19 |
Petros KOKKALIS | GUE/NGL | Greece | 13 |
Matthias ECKE | S&D | Germany | 11 |
Linea SØGAARD-LIDELL | RE | Denmark | 10 |
Pernille WEISS | PPE | Denmark | 10 |
Nicola BEER | RE | Germany | 10 |
Engin EROGLU | RE | Germany | 10 |
Manon AUBRY | GUE/NGL | France | 9 |
Gilles BOYER | RE | France | 8 |
Rasmus ANDRESEN | Verts/ALE | Germany | 8 |
Siegfried MUREŞAN | PPE | Romania | 7 |
Bas EICKHOUT | Verts/ALE | Netherlands | 7 |
Sirpa PIETIKÄINEN | PPE | Finland | 6 |
Pierre LARROUTUROU | S&D | France | 6 |
Gabriele BISCHOFF | S&D | Germany | 4 |
Stéphanie YON-COURTIN | RE | France | 3 |
Jytte GUTELAND | S&D | Sweden | 3 |
Kira Marie PETER-HANSEN | Verts/ALE | Denmark | 3 |
Miriam DALLI | S&D | Malta | 2 |
Carlo CALENDA | S&D | Italy | 2 |
Ernest URTASUN | Verts/ALE | Spain | 1 |
Asger CHRISTENSEN | RE | Denmark | 1 |
By types
Amendments (1603)Plenary speeches (2)
Shadow reports (1)
By dossiers
Count | Dossier Reference | Title |
202 | 2023/0081(COD) | Framework of measures for strengthening Europe’s net-zero technology products manufacturing ecosystem (Net Zero Industry Act) |
115 | 2021/0218(COD) | Renewable Energy Directive |
104 | 2020/0360(COD) | Trans-European energy infrastructure |
83 | 2021/0426(COD) | Energy performance of buildings |
81 | 2023/0079(COD) | Framework for ensuring a secure and sustainable supply of critical raw materials |
66 | 2022/2146(INI) | Further reform of corporate taxation rules |
59 | 2021/0206(COD) | Social Climate Fund |
45 | 2019/2189(INI) | A comprehensive European approach to energy storage |
42 | 2021/2077(INI) | Implementation of the Energy Performance of Buildings Directive |
41 | 2021/2010(INI) | Digital taxation: OECD negotiations, tax residency of digital companies and a possible European Digital Tax |
40 | 2020/2241(INI) | A European Strategy for Energy System Integration |
40 | 2023/2111(INI) | Geothermal energy |
39 | 2021/2074(INI) | The impact of national tax reforms on the EU economy |
38 | 2022/2080(INI) | Lessons learnt from the Pandora Papers and other revelations |
35 | 2020/0266(COD) | Digital finance: Digital Operational Resilience Act (DORA) |
35 | 2020/2269(INI) | Investigation of alleged contraventions and maladministration in the application of Union law in relation to the protection of animals during transport within and outside the Union |
34 | 2021/0205(COD) | Sustainable aviation fuels (ReFuelEU Aviation Initiative) |
34 | 2022/0413(CNS) | Taxation: administrative cooperation |
32 | 2021/2097(INI) | A European Withholding Tax framework |
29 | 2021/2006(INI) | An EU strategy to reduce methane emissions |
29 | 2021/2012(INI) | A European strategy for offshore renewable energy |
24 | 2020/2258(INI) | Reforming the EU policy on harmful tax practices (including the reform of the Code of Conduct Group) |
22 | 2023/2058(INI) | Role of tax policy in times of crisis |
22 | 2023/0187(CNS) | Faster and Safer Relief of Excess Withholding Taxes |
21 | 2020/2254(INL) | Fair and simpler taxation supporting the recovery strategy (EP follow-up to the July Commission’s Action Plan and its 25 initiatives in the area of VAT, business and individual taxation) |
19 | 2020/2075(INI) | The review of the macroeconomic legislative framework for a better impact on Europe’s real economy and improved transparency of decision-making and democratic accountability |
18 | 2020/2259(INI) | Creating an economically, socially and environmentally sustainable European tax system in the post-COVID economy |
18 | 2023/0076(COD) | Wholesale energy market: Union’s protection against market manipulation |
17 | 2021/0197(COD) | CO2 emission standards for cars and vans |
16 | 2020/2070(INI) | Maximising the energy efficiency potential of the EU building stock |
16 | 2020/0104(COD) | Recovery and Resilience Facility |
16 | 2020/2043(INI) | Towards a WTO-compatible EU carbon border adjustment mechanism |
16 | 2020/2046(INI) | Implementation of EU requirements for exchange of tax information: progress, lessons learnt and obstacles to overcome |
14 | 2020/2058(INI) | Sustainable Europe Investment Plan - How to finance the Green Deal |
13 | 2023/0077(COD) | Union’s electricity market design |
12 | 2020/0141(NLE) | Research Fund for Coal and Steel: research programme and multiannual technical guidelines |
12 | 2020/2263(INI) | Implementation of the 6th VAT Directive: what is the missing part to reduce the EU VAT gap? |
12 | 2021/0213(CNS) | Energy Taxation Directive |
12 | 2021/0342(COD) | Amendments to the Capital Requirements Regulation |
12 | 2022/0396(COD) | Packaging and packaging waste |
7 | 2021/2061(INI) | Economic policies of the euro area 2021 |
7 | 2021/0203(COD) | Energy Efficiency Directive |
7 | 2022/0164(COD) | REPowerEU chapters in recovery and resilience plans |
6 | 2020/2076(INI) | A New Industrial Strategy for Europe |
6 | 2020/0148(CNS) | Administrative cooperation in the field of taxation |
6 | 2021/2185(INI) | Competition policy - annual report 2021 |
4 | 2020/0006(COD) | Just Transition Fund |
4 | 2020/0036(COD) | European Climate Law |
4 | 2021/0227(BUD) | 2022 general budget: all sections |
3 | 2020/2077(INI) | New Circular Economy Action Plan |
3 | 2021/0433(CNS) | Minimum level of taxation for multinational groups |
3 | 2023/0138(COD) | Effective coordination of economic policies and multilateral budgetary surveillance |
2 | 2020/2023(INI) | Recommendations on the negotiations for a new partnership with the United Kingdom of Great Britain and Northern Ireland |
2 | 2020/0268(COD) | Digital Finance: amending Directive regarding Digital Operational Resilience requirements |
2 | 2022/0051(COD) | Corporate Sustainability Due Diligence |
1 | 2019/2126(INI) | Financial activities of the European Investment Bank - annual report 2019 |
1 | 2020/0066(COD) | Capital Requirements Regulation: adjustments in response to the COVID-19 pandemic |
1 | 2020/2036(INI) | Further development of the Capital Markets Union (CMU): improving access to capital market finance, in particular by SMEs, and further enabling retail investor participation |
See historical changes of the Bio
Born
1985/06/29 - KobenhavnEducation (qualifications and diplomas)
- 08/2016-01/2022 : PhD in Political Science, Copenhagen Business School
- 08/2009-01/2010 : Exchange student in political science, Paris Institute of Political Studies (Science Po)
- 08/2005-02/2012 : MSc in Political Science, Københavns Universitet (University of Copenhagen)
Professional career
- 2023 : Vice-Chair of the European Parliament's Delegation for relations with the Arab Peninsula (DARP)
- 2019 : Member of the European Parliament, S&D Group, elected as a member of the Danish Social Democrats. Member of the Committee on Industry, Research and Energy (ITRE). Substitute Member of the Committee on Economic and Monetary Affairs (ECON). Member of the Delegation for relations with the People’s Republic of China (D-CN). Substitute Member of the Delegation to the EU-Türkiye Joint Parliamentary Committee (D-TR). Substitute Member of the Subcommittee on Tax Matters (FISC). Substitute Member of the Committee of Inquiry on the Protection of Animals during Transport (ANIT). Vice-President of the Intergroup on the Welfare and Conservation of Animals.
- 2016-2019 : Analyst, Cevea
- 2017 : Visiting Researcher, Boston University
- 2016-2017 : External Lecturer, DIS – Study Abroad
- 2013-2016 : Campaign Consultant / Senior Consultant, Danish Social Democrats
- 2013-2014 : External Lecturer, University of Copenhagen
- 2013-2014 : External Lecturer, DIS – Study Abroad
- 2013 : Campaigner, Greenpeace Denmark
- 2011-2013 : Political advisor and team leader, office of Dan Jørgensen MEP
- 2010 : Trainee, office of Dan Jørgensen MEP
- 2007-2009 : Student employee, Danish Ministry of Finance
Niels FUGLSANG on
History
(these mark the time of scraping, not the official date of the change)
2024-06-29Show (7) Changes | Timetravel
CV/Education (qualifications and diplomas)/0 |
08/2016-01/2022 : PhD in Political Science, Copenhagen Business School
|
CV/Education (qualifications and diplomas)/0 |
2016-2021 : PhD in Political Science, Copenhagen Business School
|
CV/Education (qualifications and diplomas)/1 |
08/2009-01/2010 : Exchange student in political science, Paris Institute of Political Studies (Science Po)
|
CV/Education (qualifications and diplomas)/1 |
2009-2010 : Exchange student in political science, Paris Institute of Political Studies (Science Po)
|
CV/Education (qualifications and diplomas)/2 |
08/2005-02/2012 : MSc in Political Science, Københavns Universitet (University of Copenhagen)
|
CV/Education (qualifications and diplomas)/2 |
2005-2011 : MSc in Political Science, Københavns Universitet (University of Copenhagen)
|
CV/updated |
Old
2023-06-08T00:00:00New
2024-06-28T00:00:00 |
2023-06-08Show (5) Changes | Timetravel
CV/Professional career/0 |
2023 : Vice-Chair of the European Parliament's Delegation for relations with the Arab Peninsula (DARP)
|
CV/Professional career/0 |
2013 : Vice-Chair of the European Parliament's Delegation for relations with the Arab Peninsula (DARP)
|
CV/Professional career/1 |
2019 : Member of the European Parliament, S&D Group, elected as a member of the Danish Social Democrats. Member of the Committee on Industry, Research and Energy (ITRE). Substitute Member of the Committee on Economic and Monetary Affairs (ECON). Member of the Delegation for relations with the People’s Republic of China (D-CN). Substitute Member of the Delegation to the EU-Türkiye Joint Parliamentary Committee (D-TR). Substitute Member of the Subcommittee on Tax Matters (FISC). Substitute Member of the Committee of Inquiry on the Protection of Animals during Transport (ANIT). Vice-President of the Intergroup on the Welfare and Conservation of Animals.
|
CV/Professional career/1 |
2019 : Member of the European Parliament, S&D Group, elected as a member of the Danish Social Democrats. Member of the Committee on Industry, Research and Energy (ITRE). Substitute Member of the Committee on Economic and Monetary Affairs (ECON). Member of the Delegation for Relations with the People’s Republic of China (D-CN). Substitute Member of the Delegation to the EU-Türkiye Joint Parliamentary Committee (D-TR). Substitute Member of the Subcommittee on Tax Matters (FISC). Substitute Member of the Committee of Inquiry on the Protection of Animals during Transport (ANIT). Vice-President of the Intergroup on the Welfare and Conservation of Animals.
|
CV/updated |
Old
2023-05-30T00:00:00New
2023-06-08T00:00:00 |
2023-05-30Show (6) Changes | Timetravel
CV/Education (qualifications and diplomas)/0 |
2016-2021 : PhD in Political Science, Copenhagen Business School
|
CV/Education (qualifications and diplomas)/0 |
2016- ... : PhD Fellow, Copenhagen Business School
|
CV/Professional career/0 |
2013 : Vice-Chair of the European Parliament's Delegation for relations with the Arab Peninsula (DARP)
|
CV/Professional career/0 |
2019 : Member of the European Parliament, S&D Group, elected as a member of the Danish Social Democrats. Member of the Committee on Industry, Research and Energy (ITRE); Substitute Member of the Committee on Economic and Monetary Affairs (ECON). Member of the Delegation for Relations with the People’s Republic of China (D-CN). Substitute Member of the Delegation to the EU-Turkey Joint Parliamentary Committee (D-TR). Substitute Member of the Subcommittee on Tax Matters (FISC). Substitute Member of the Committee of Inquiry on the Protection of Animals during Transport (ANIT). Vice-President of the Intergroup on the Welfare and Conservation of Animals.
|
CV/Professional career/1 |
2019 : Member of the European Parliament, S&D Group, elected as a member of the Danish Social Democrats. Member of the Committee on Industry, Research and Energy (ITRE). Substitute Member of the Committee on Economic and Monetary Affairs (ECON). Member of the Delegation for Relations with the People’s Republic of China (D-CN). Substitute Member of the Delegation to the EU-Türkiye Joint Parliamentary Committee (D-TR). Substitute Member of the Subcommittee on Tax Matters (FISC). Substitute Member of the Committee of Inquiry on the Protection of Animals during Transport (ANIT). Vice-President of the Intergroup on the Welfare and Conservation of Animals.
|
CV/updated |
Old
2021-02-11T00:00:00New
2023-05-30T00:00:00 |
2021-02-11Show (1) Changes
CV |
|